THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:19:04 PM
Joly, Jacqueline Lorraine
CPSO#:
61671
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Oct 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jacqueline Joly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Canada
111 St Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y8
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019
Instructions/Address:RSRS Patient support at 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 26 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 1989 to 18 Oct 1989
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |