THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:22:17 AM
Lau, Michael Chi-Kit
CPSO#:
61668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-886-4186
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:28 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHI-KIT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1992 |