THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:49:25 AM
Ung, Yee Chung
CPSO#:
61661
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4834
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:15 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YEE CHUNG UNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Mar 1993
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Dec 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1993 |