THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:19:26 AM
Duncan, Jacqueline Mary De Lourdes
CPSO#:
61654
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Mar 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 232 Station Main
Midland ON L4R 4K8
Phone: 7059378346
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jacqueline Duncan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARY DE LOURDES DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1992 |