THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:09:13 AM
Kagoma, Peter Kyambadde
CPSO#:
61643
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ganda
Education: University of Lagos, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0
Phone: 613 525 2222 Ext. 4177
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Uganda
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER KYAMBADDE KAGOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGOMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: August 23, 2018
Summary:
“On February 23, 2018, the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners ordered a suspension, without a hearing, of Dr. Kagoma’s license to practice medicine and surgery in the State of New Jersey. This order was issued after the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners received notice of the specified continuing education and remediation program (SCERP) ordered by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in June 8, 2016 (see Concerns for more information on the College’s action). Dr. Kagoma’s license lapsed in New Jersey in 1989 due to failure to renew. The CPSO was notified of this order by a report dated May 3, 2018.
The New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners has stated this order of summary suspension is administrative and is not considered to be a disciplinary action against Dr. Kagoma’s licence.”
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kagoma has completed all requirements of the SCERP effective September 27, 2018
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)