THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:32:25 PM
Hodge, William Gerald
CPSO#:
61641
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: William G. Hodge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 29, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 29, 2021, St. Joseph’s Health Care London notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 of the Regulated Health Professions Act), that St. Joseph’s Health Care London suspended Dr. Hodge’s hospital privileges in connection with reviews into Dr. Hodge’s practice.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 12, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 12, 2021, London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph’s Health Care London notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective July 11, 2021, Dr. Hodge agreed to voluntarily cease exercising his privileges at St. Joseph’s Health Care London.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:19 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Sep 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hodge engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his Ophthalmology practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Hodge will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.
Dr. Hodge’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.
Download Full Document (PDF)