THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:53:48 AM
Goldstein, David Howard
CPSO#:
61640
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Dec 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
131 Mahogany Way SE
Calgary AB T3M 1N6
Phone: 403 390 4533
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID HOWARD GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Dec 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1991 |