THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:23:42 PM
Al-Saadon, Khalid B H
CPSO#:
61633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A-130 Mitton St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6G6
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALID B H AL-SAADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAADON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |