THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:16:14 AM
Rawlinson, John
CPSO#:
61611
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Radiology
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. x1222
Fax: 905-336-4148
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 May 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN RAWLINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWLINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1997 |