THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:27:17 AM
Rosoph, Leslie Andrew
CPSO#:
61606
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 Cassells Street
North Bay ON P1B 3Z7
Phone: (705) 476-3376
Fax: (705) 476-3967
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
USA - Vermont
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:23 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE ANDREW ROSOPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSOPH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1989 |