THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:58:30 AM
Goldberg, Pamela Ruth
CPSO#:
61597
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesiology
Suite 1-E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566520
Fax: 18557563454
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAMELA RUTH GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1996 |