THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:07:14 PM
Snaiderman, Abraham
CPSO#:
61592
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Snaiderman, Abraham Hass (used until: 19 Aug 1992 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Inst.
University Health Network
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3605
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM SNAIDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNAIDERMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1991 |