THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:02:58 AM
Champagne, Caro Line
CPSO#:
61574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6495
Fax: (519) 749-6997
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CARO LINE CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |