THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:34:39 PM
Kahn, Larry
CPSO#:
61563
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L. Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |