THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:38:58 AM
Bikangaga, Peter Mwesigye
CPSO#:
61555
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Makerere Univ, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Phone: (905) 456-5656
Fax: (905) 456-9572
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:13 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER MWESIGYE BIKANGAGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIKANGAGA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1995 |