THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:00:57 PM
Murty, Naresh Kumar
CPSO#:
61553
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Mysore University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Phone: 905 522 8830
Fax: 905 522 9371
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:31 Aug 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR MURTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1997 |