THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:40:34 PM
Krahn, Andrew David
CPSO#:
61524
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Krahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Oct 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2012 |