THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:19:33 PM
Nguyen, Minh The
CPSO#:
61511
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.T. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1/ 205-1919 Riverside Drive, Ottawa
2/Dymon storage
323 Coventry Road
Ottawa, ON
Request by Fax to 613-737-6048
Date Received: 26 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:28 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:26 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |