THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:13:04 AM
McElhaney, Janet Elizabeth
CPSO#:
61485
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
21 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-Oct-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Janet E. McElhaney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:26 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 21 Oct 2021 |