THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:16:49 PM
Angle, Pamela Jean
CPSO#:
61443
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Harvard Medical School, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sun nybrook Health Sciences Ctr
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87757
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAMELA JEAN ANGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1989 |