THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:41:43 PM
Khalili, Ali
CPSO#:
61430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Persian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
imperial college London
diabetic center
P O Box 48338
Abu Dhabi 48338
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 9712-4040922
Fax: 9712-4040900
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI KHALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALILI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1990 |