THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:13:39 PM
Razvi, Hassan
CPSO#:
61423
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Division of Urology
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6259
Fax: (519) 646-6037
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:29 Aug 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASSAN RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1991 |