THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:50:05 PM
Harrison, Mark Marshall
CPSO#:
61380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Apr 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
234 Willingdon Ave
Kingston ON K7L 4J1
Phone: 6134490477
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact:
Release of Information
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
166 Brock St., Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 extension 4125
Fax: 613-542-8071
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 14 Jun 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK MARSHALL HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 1992 |