THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:11:47 AM
Zeglinski, Joy Ann
CPSO#:
61374
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
202-2277 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X6
Phone: 613-737-1194 Ext. 0
Fax: 613-737-5884
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOY ANN ZEGLINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEGLINSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2000 to 14 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2005 to 05 Sep 2006
CF - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2006 to 11 May 2007
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1991 |