THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:06:30 PM
Rendak, Ian
CPSO#:
61364
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ian Rendak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 1 2016
Corporation Name: Ian Rendak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 4 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2022 |