THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:09:01 AM
Fregonas, Claudio Giovanni
CPSO#:
61327
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7424
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIO GIOVANNI FREGONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREGONAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1990 |