THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:35:16 PM
Burk-Vassallo, Jane Lorraine
CPSO#:
61322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Vassallo, Jane Lorraine (used until: 09 Oct 2012 )
Burk, Jane Lorraine (used until: 21 Oct 1990 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 30
100 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 3P1
Phone: (905) 397-1122
Fax: (905) 397-5337
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jane L. Burk-Vassallo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANE LORRAINE BURK-VASSALLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURK-VASSALLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1990 |