THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:40:31 AM
Lowe, Alan David
CPSO#:
61298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416 756 6919
Fax: 416 756 6318
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID LOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1993 |