THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:14:00 AM
Johnson, David Walter
CPSO#:
61230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
695 Canterbury Street
Woodstock ON N4S 8W7
Phone: (519) 537-5052
Fax: (519) 539-0476
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID WALTER JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1990 |