THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:50:30 PM
Banerji, Anna
CPSO#:
61211
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Pediatric Consultation Clinic
30 The Queensway
3rd Floor OLM Wing
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: 416-530-6294
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA BANERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2003 |