THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:17:30 PM
Wolff, Bryan Christopher
CPSO#:
61196
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6001
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRYAN CHRISTOPHER WOLFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFF is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1990 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: November 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDING OF GUILT
Bryan Christopher Wolff was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Operation of a Motor Vehicle with over 80 mg blood alcohol, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada
Date: October 21, 2021
Sentence: 1 year driving prohibition; fine of $2,500.00; Victim Surcharge of $750