THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:32:37 AM
Jones, David Stephen Rhys
CPSO#:
61183
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. Stephen Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For patient records please contact:
Records Management 1-800-775-0093 or 647-693-7735.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 May 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Jun 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1997 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 01 Sep 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jul 2023 |