THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:13:10 PM
Dew, Bernard
CPSO#:
61173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BERNARD DEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1990 |