THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:47:58 AM
Rival, Richard Allan
CPSO#:
61150
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
712 davis dr suite 101a
Newmarket ON L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905 )830-6711
Fax: (905) 898-7698
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD ALLAN RIVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1990 |