THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:20:30 AM
Gallay, Stephen Howard
CPSO#:
61131
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
65 Bayly Street West
Level 1, Suite 100
Ajax ON L1S 7K7
Phone: (905) 426-2233
Fax: (905) 426-3306
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:11 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN HOWARD GALLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1990 |