THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:14:32 AM
Goldfarb, Cynthia Ellen
CPSO#:
61117
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cynthia Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ELLEN GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1991 |