THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:09:22 AM
Wong, Cynthia Sau-Yin
CPSO#:
61111
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cynthia Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 15 Jan 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA SAU-YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1990 |