THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:36:25 PM
Wong, Ophelia Ching Yee
CPSO#:
61108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Nov 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Nov 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:As of July 1, 2023, Dr Nataraj Chettiar (CPSO 97461) is taking over Dr. Wong's practise and he has all records.
Date Received: 11 Apr 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OPHELIA CHING YEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1990 |