THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:49:40 AM
Sandejas, Mario Fernandez
CPSO#:
61097
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. Sandejas Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents looking to obtain medical records may call:
RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 Sep 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2002 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2002 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 03 Sep 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2001
Summary:
On April 16, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sandejas guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.
The Committee directed the following penalty:
(1) recorded reprimand;
(2) 18-months suspension, to commence no later than June 1, 2001, six-months of the suspension to be suspended provided Dr. Sandejas continues to receive care from a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar; and,
The Committee imposed the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Sandejas( certificate of registration:
(A) that Dr. Sandejas( practice be restricted to patients over the age of 16 years. The term to be removed upon Dr. Sandejas undergoing a forensic psychiatric assessment by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar and upon that psychiatrist providing a report to the Registrar indicating that Dr. Sandejas is within the lowest risk category for recurrence of sexual misconduct.
On May 8, 2001 the College appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. On May 16, 2001, Dr. Sandejas cross appealed the decision to the Divisional Court.
On June 17, 2002, the College abandoned the appeal to the Divisional Court. On June 28, 2002, Dr. Sandejas abandoned his cross-appeal..
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-06-28
Hearing Date(s): Oct 13, 2000
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 3, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mario Fernandez Sandejas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 3, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sandejas engaged in professional misconduct and is incompetent in his practice. During the investigation, Dr. Sandejas resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. In light of his resignation and undertaking not to reapply, these matters were not before the Discipline Committee and no findings were made.
Download Full Document (PDF)