THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:20:35 AM
Jeans, Elizabeth Rosanne
CPSO#:
61094
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
425 Locust Street
Burlington ON L7S 1T8
Phone: (905) 340-0401
Fax: (905) 340-0426
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Elizabeth Rose Jeans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:07 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:04 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ROSANNE JEANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEANS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1992 |