THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:47:37 AM
Nadarajah, Sumathi
CPSO#:
61077
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 569-8100
Fax: (905) 607-3384
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:21 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUMATHI NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1990 |