THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:54:18 PM
Murto, Kimmo Tomi Tapio
CPSO#:
61057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Finnish, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department Of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMMO TOMI TAPIO MURTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1991 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1992 |