THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:02:38 AM
meyers, kimberly Lois
CPSO#:
61053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Emo Clinic
PO Box 569
Emo ON P0W 1E0
Phone: (807) 482-2323 Ext. 5660
Fax: (807) 482-3089
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Emo |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY LOIS MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1991 |