THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:07:10 AM
Vardy, Rhonda Marie
CPSO#:
61035
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Shaw Clinic
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7467
Fax: (905) 883-2331
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RHONDA MARIE VARDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARDY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1990 |