THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:49:38 PM
Rahal, Hussain Ahmad
CPSO#:
61011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2081 Merivale Road
Unit 1300
Ottawa ON K2G 1G9
Phone: (613) 739-3044
Fax: (613) 739-4995
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUSSAIN AHMAD RAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1990 |