THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:06:44 AM
Chen, Connie
CPSO#:
60980
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
21-325 Central Pky W
Peel Healthy Sexuality Clinic
Peel Public Health
Mississauga ON L5B 3X9
Phone: 9052700587
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Connie Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CONNIE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1991 |