THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:42:57 AM
Huang, Jane
CPSO#:
60979
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Huang-Nathens, Jane (used until: 03 Dec 2012 )
Huang, Jane (used until: 15 Apr 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANE HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1990 |