THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:29:28 PM
Sabetti, Linda Marian
CPSO#:
60970
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Suite 420
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Phone: (905) 625-1619
Fax: (905)625-9362
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDA MARIAN SABETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABETTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1990 |