THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:12:13 PM
Graham, Caroline Hart
CPSO#:
60958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 638-6107
Fax: (416) 638-9484
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 28 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
|
Active |