THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:10:01 AM
Kettle, Charles Alfred
CPSO#:
60929
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 7056735035
Fax: 7056735931
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:28 Aug 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES ALFRED KETTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KETTLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1990 |